Sream, Inc. et al v. Ralh et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream, Inc.
Defendant: Makhan Ralh and Makhan Singh
Case Number: 2:2018cv03064
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/23/19 DISMISSING #1 Complaint and the entire action with prejudice. The other terms of the settlement shall remain confidential and the Parties are to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The Eastern District of California Shall retain jurisdiction over Plaintiffs and Defendant arising from or related to any future dispute over the confidential settlement agreement. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Makhan Ralh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daniels, David) Modified on 1/22/2019 (Washington, S).
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Errata re Joint Stipulation by Makhan Ralh re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Daniels, David)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Makhan Ralh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daniels, David) Modified on 1/22/2019 (Washington, S).
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to a #6 Stipulated Notice of Settlement filed on 1/11/2019, this case has settled. Accordingly, the parties shall file their disposition documents pursuant to Local Rule 160(b), and no later than 2/4/2019. All other pending dates shall remain as previously set. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Makhan Ralh. Dispositional Docs due by 2/4/2019. (Daniels, David) Modified on 1/14/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION to EXTEND Time up to and including 1/11/2019 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Makhan Ralh. Attorney Daniels, David M. added. (Daniels, David) Modified on 12/26/2018 (York, M).
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Makhan Ralh served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Vakil, Imran)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 2,235,638 * * 3/30/1999 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #2:* 2,307,176 * * 1/11/2000 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #3:* 3,675,839 * * 9/1/2009 * * Martin Birzle * ; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Trademark Report, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Makhan Ralh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Imran F. Vakil* *Nexio PC* *245 Fischer Avenue Suite C3* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Makhan Ralh by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. Attorney Vakil, Imran F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7987884) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Ralh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makhan Ralh
Represented By: David M. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makhan Singh
Represented By: David M. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?