Brice v. California Faculty Association

Plaintiff: William D. Brice
Defendant: California Faculty Association
Case Number: 2:2018cv03106
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER by California Faculty Association.(Kronland, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the February 21, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Appoint Receiver for Designation of Successor in Interests (ECF No. 65) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the February 21, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Change Venue (ECF No. 16) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to TRANSFER VENUE by California Faculty Association. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England. Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland, #3 Declaration of Jacqueline Tepeen, #4 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/19 DECLINING to relate cases. (Coll, A)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/09/19. Added attorney Jeffrey D. Jennings, PHV for William D. Brice. (Benson, A.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/09/19. Added attorney Milton L. Chappell, PHV for William D. Brice. (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by William D. Brice for attorney Milton L. Chappell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8040633) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burlingham, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Not More than 28 Days by California Faculty Association. (Pitts, Patrick) Modified on 12/26/2018 (Benson, A.).
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Patrick Casey Pitts on behalf of California Faculty Association. Attorney Pitts, Patrick Casey added. (Pitts, Patrick)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott A. Kronland on behalf of California Faculty Association. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by William D. Brice for attorney Jeffrey D. Jennings to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8030397) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burlingham, Steven)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by William D. Brice re #2 Notice. (Burlingham, Steven) Modified on 12/12/2018 (Kaminski, H).
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: William D. Brice served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Burlingham, Steven)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02419, 2:18-cv-02574, 2:18-cv-02961, 2:18-cv-02230 by William D. Brice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Burlingham, Steven) Modified on 12/10/2018 (Kaminski, H).
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Faculty Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven R. Burlingham* *Gary, Till, Burlingham & Lynch* *1380 Lead Hill Blvd. Suite 200* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Claim of Unconstitutionality by William D. Brice re #1 Complaint. (Burlingham, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Faculty Association by William D. Brice. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7994489) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burlingham, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brice v. California Faculty Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Faculty Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Brice
Represented By: Steven R. Burlingham
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Jennings, PHV
Represented By: Milton L. Chappell, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?