(PS) Jones v. USA
Plaintiff: Rodney Jones
Defendant: Joshua Root, Peter Sawtell and USA
Case Number: 2:2018cv03110
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/19/18 GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are GRANTED until 2/22/19 to respond to the complaint. (Coll, A)
December 20, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Rodney Jones. (Coll, A)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for EXTENSION of TIME to Respond to Complaint and PROPOSED ORDER by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip A. Scarborough)(Scarborough, Philip) Modified on 12/19/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by USA. (Scarborough, Philip)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 4/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta County Superior Court, case number 18CL0395 by Rodney Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Substitution of United States as Party Defendant, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarborough, Philip) Modified on 11/30/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Jones v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Root
Represented By: Philip A. Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Sawtell
Represented By: Philip A. Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Philip A. Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?