Continental Insurance Company v. National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Defendant: National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC and National Pecan Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv03170
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by National Pecan Company, National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC. Attorney Stroud, Andrew W. added. (Stroud, Andrew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Continental Insurance Company. (Kirsch, Joshua) Modified on 12/26/2018 (Benson, A.).
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: National Pecan Company served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Continental Insurance Company. Attorney Kirsch, Joshua E. added. (Kirsch, Joshua)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *National Pecan Company, National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anna Gourgiotopoulou* *Gibson Robb & Lindh, LLP* *201 Mission St, Suite 2700* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Kastilahn, A)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Continental Insurance Company. (Gourgiotopoulou, Anna)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT 1 to Complaint by Continental Insurance Company. (Gourgiotopoulou, Anna)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against National Pecan Company, National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC by Continental Insurance Company. Attorney Gourgiotopoulou, Anna added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8007192) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gourgiotopoulou, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Insurance Company v. National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Pecan Shelling Operations, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Pecan Company
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Anna Gourgiotopoulou
Represented By: Joshua E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?