United States of America v. Approximately $80,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $80,000.00 in U.S. Currency and Approximately $33,740.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2018mc00005
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/15/2018 EXTENDING Time to 6/15/21018, for the United States to file a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture. (York, M)
April 20, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/19/18, ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 5/17/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
February 15, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/15/2018 ORDERING the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 4/17/2018. (Zignago, K.)
January 17, 2018 2 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/16/2018 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 2/16/2018. (Washington, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $80,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $80,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $33,740.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?