Duarte et al v. Stockton City et al
Case Number: 2:2019cv00007
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/3/2020 GRANTING Defendants leave to file an Amended Answer to the First Amended Complaint, on or before 11/13/2020. (Becknal, R)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/16/20 GRANTING 54 Application to Continue hearing. HEARING as to 52 Motion for Summary Judgment RESET for 11/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The parties may file supplemental opposition and reply papers in accordance with that revised hearing date and the Local Rules should they wish to do so. (Kaminski, H)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/30/20 ORDERING that Counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for defendants shall meet and confer regarding the pending motion to retain confidentiality and attempt to resolve their diffe rences regarding the confidential designation of documents. If the parties are unable to resolve their dispute after the conference, they may renotice defendants' motion for sanctions and motion to retain confidentiality for hearing and argument. Any differences unresolved by the conference shall be submitted to the court in a Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute. The Joint Statement shall be filed no later than fourteen days prior to the hearing, if any. (Kaminski, H)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/13/20 GRANTING 43 Request to Seal documents. (Kaminski, H)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/27/2020 MODIFYING the briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiffs' opposition to 36 Motion for Sanctions due by 7/23/2020, Defendants' Reply due by 7/30/2020. Motion Hearing date re 36 set for 8/20/2020 before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/21/2020 GRANTING Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss as follows: DISMISSING the First, Second, Third and Fourth Claims to the extent they are predicated on alleged Fourte enth Amendment violations; DISMISSING without leave to amend Plaintiffs' Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims on grounds that they are barred by Heck, and because the Court believes further leave to amend would be futile; GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants City of Stockton and the Stockton Police Department from the First and Second Claims without leave to amend; and this case shall proceed on Plaintiffs' remaining claims. (Becknal, R)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/28/2020 ORDERING Non-Expert Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 8/7/2020, any Rebuttal by 9/4/2020, and Dispositive Motions filed by 11/6/2020.(Reader, L)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/23/2020 ORDERING Non-Expert Discovery cut-off by 5/1/2020. Expert Witness Disclosure due by 7/3/2020. Rebuttal Witness Disclosure due by 7/31/2020, and Dispositive Motions filed by 10/2/2020. (Reader, L)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/30/2019. The Initial Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery 3/31/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure 5/29/2020, Rebuttal Witness Disclosure 6/30/2020 and Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 8/28/2020. (Deutsch, S)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/28/2019 GRANTING 9 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to file the First Amended Complaint not later than ten (10) days following the date this Order is filed.(Becknal, R)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/19. (Coll, A)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/20/19 GRANTING defendants until 3/1/19 to file an amended answer. (Coll, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte et al v. Stockton City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?