(PC) Everett v. Patterson

Plaintiff: Richard C. Everett
Defendant: Patterson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00077
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
January 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: (ECF No. 5) Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction served on Richard C. Everett. (Yin, K)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION (TEXT ONLY): After initial screening, the complaint filed in this action was determined to be an amended complaint in case no. 2:18-cv-1082 CKD. Pursuant to Chambers request the Clerk of the Court filed the #1 complaint as an amended complaint in case no. 2:18-cv-1082 and this action is CLOSED. (Yin, K)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for, CDCR# AF-5392 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
January 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Richard C. Everett. (Coll, A)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/11/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Coll, A)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Richard C. Everett. (Coll, A)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Patterson by Richard C. Everett.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Everett v. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?