Masi v. J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Masi
Defendant: J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Cross Defendant: United States of America
Intervenor Plaintiff: The Hartford
Case Number: 2:2019cv00121
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Karen L. Jacobsen* *Jacobsen & McElroy PC* *2401 American River Dr. #100* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Coll, A)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CROSSCLAIM against The United States of America by J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Jacobsen, Karen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS049451 by J & J Maintenance, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8063198) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice, #6 Exhibit, #7 Notice, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jacobsen, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masi v. J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Masi
Represented By: Andrew G. Minney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: The Hartford
Represented By: Barry W. Ponticello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?