(PC) Smith v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Christopher Smith
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Charles R. Brehmer, Keith Fagundes and Lisa S. Green
Case Number: 2:2019cv00287
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/11/2019 ORDERING Plaintiff to file a signed IFP application within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
April 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Henshaw, R)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to COMPEL CDCR to Provide Certified Trust Statement by Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Coll, A) Modified on 4/1/2019 (Plummer, M).
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Washington, S)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for RELIEF from JUDGMENT per Frd. R. Civ. P. 60 by Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Henshaw, R)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for JOINDER of CLAIMS by Lawrence Christopher Smith in. (Henshaw, R)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to AMEND Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Henshaw, R)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lawrence Christopher Smith.(Becknal, R)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/25/2019 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
February 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Henshaw, R)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Benson, A.)
February 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lawrence Christopher Smith. (Benson, A.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lawrence Christopher Smith.(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Smith v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Brehmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Fagundes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?