Gabriele et al v. Service Employees International Union, Local 1000 et al
Plaintiff: Jen-Fang Lee, Stacy Penning, Charles Friedrichs and Mark Gabriele
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, Local 1021, California Teachers Association, National Education Association of the United States, California Faculty Association, Service Employees International Union, Local 1000 and Service Employees International Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv00292
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Service Employees International Union* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradford G. Hughes* *Clark Hill PLC* *1055 West 7th St, 24th Fl* *Los Angeles, CA 90017*. (Kastilahn, A)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Stacy Penning, Jen-Fang Lee, Charles Friedrichs, Mark Gabriele. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hughes, Bradford)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/29/19 ADDING Attorney John J. Bursch, PHV for Plaintiffs. (Kastilahn, A)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order (ECF No. 14). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Charles Friedrichs, Mark Gabriele, Jen-Fang Lee, Stacy Penning for attorney John J. Bursch to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Hughes, Bradford)
March 27, 2019 PAYMENT for Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8182268. (Hughes, Bradford)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Gregory N. Longworth, PHV for Plaintiff signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/20/19. (Becknal, R)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Daniel Dulworth, PHV for Plaintiffs signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/20/19. (Becknal, R)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend time to respond to complaint #1 by California Faculty Association, California Teachers Association, National Education Association of the United States, Service Employees International Union, Local 1000, Service Employees International Union, Local 1021. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 3/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Charles Friedrichs, Mark Gabriele, Jen-Fang Lee, Stacy Penning for attorney Gregory N. Longworth to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8155520) (Hughes, Bradford)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Charles Friedrichs, Mark Gabriele, Jen-Fang Lee, Stacy Penning for attorney Daniel J. Dulworth to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8155475) (Hughes, Bradford)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Service Employees International Union, Local 1021 served on 2/26/2019. (Hughes, Bradford) Modified on 3/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: National Education Association of the United States served on 2/26/2019. (Hughes, Bradford) Modified on 3/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Teachers Association served on 2/26/2019. (Hughes, Bradford) Modified on 3/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Faculty Association served on 2/25/2019. (Hughes, Bradford) Modified on 3/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Service Employees International Union, Local 1000 served on 2/25/2019. (Hughes, Bradford) Modified on 3/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Faculty Association, California Teachers Association, National Education Association of the United States, Service Employees International Union, Local 1000, Service Employees International Union, Local 1021* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradford G. Hughes* *Clark Hill PLC* *1055 West 7th Street, 24th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90017*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Stacy Penning, Jen-Fang Lee, Charles Friedrichs, Mark Gabriele. Attorney Hughes, Bradford G. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8112715) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Hughes, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriele et al v. Service Employees International Union, Local 1000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, Local 1021
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Teachers Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Education Association of the United States
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Faculty Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, Local 1000
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen-Fang Lee
Represented By: Bradford G. Hughes
Represented By: Gregory N. Longworth, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Dulworth, PHV
Represented By: John J. Bursch, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Penning
Represented By: Bradford G. Hughes
Represented By: Gregory N. Longworth, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Dulworth, PHV
Represented By: John J. Bursch, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Friedrichs
Represented By: Bradford G. Hughes
Represented By: Gregory N. Longworth, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Dulworth, PHV
Represented By: John J. Bursch, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gabriele
Represented By: Bradford G. Hughes
Represented By: Gregory N. Longworth, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Dulworth, PHV
Represented By: John J. Bursch, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?