(PC)Moore v. Ali et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Edward Moore
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services, L Cooley, Kashif Ali, J Domey and Jennifer Villa
Case Number: 2:2019cv00332
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: (ECF No. 5) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal served on Eugene Edward Moore. (Yin, K)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (text only): This case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Eugene Edward Moore. (York, M)
February 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Eugene Edward Moore. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *2/25/19*; Consent or Decline due by 4/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Eugene Edward Moore. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kashif Ali, California Correctional Health Care Services, L Cooley, J Domey, Jennifer Villa by Eugene Edward Moore.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Moore v. Ali et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Edward Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashif Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Domey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?