Galea v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Sally Galea
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00386
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/2/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A's responsive deadline to the First Amended Complaint is CONTINUED to 6/5/2019. (Reader, L)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for (to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) re #11 Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Marum, J.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Between Plaintiff and Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. only. (Ovruchesky, Clark) Modified on 5/2/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant Wells Fargo filed its Motion to Dismiss on April 1, 2019. ECF No. 5. Defendant Experian filed its answer on April 10, 2019. ECF No. 10. Within 21 days of those responsive pleadings, Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1), Plaintiff filed her First Amended Complaint on April 22, 2019. ECF No. 11. As Wells Fargos motion targeted Plaintiffs original complaint, the Court concludes that the motion has been mooted by the filing of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Accordingly, Defendant Wells Fargos Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 5, is DENIED AS MOOT.IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sally Galea.(Ovruchesky, Clark)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Woo, Donna)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Woo, Donna added.(Woo, Donna)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Marum, J.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Marum, J.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Marum, J.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Notice)(Marum, J.) Modified on 4/1/2019 (York, M).
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Attorney Marum, J. Barrett added. (Marum, J.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Clark Ovruchesky* *C.O. Law, APC* *3148 Midway Dr. Suite 203* *San Diego, CA 92110*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sally Galea. Attorney Ovruchesky, Clark added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8140840) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ovruchesky, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galea v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: J. Barrett Marum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Galea
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?