USA v. Approximately $6,567,897.50 seized from CTBC Bank, Acct No. 3800191916 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $142,139.29 seized from Bank of America, Account Number 195461020, Approximately $9,004,531.62 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800283929, 18 Karat Fashion Ring, 1.66 Ct. oval/.070 Tw round diamonds, Approximately $24,070.81 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192567, Approximately $8,559.93 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192575, Approximately $231,179.68 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192005, Approximately $1,557,738.60 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192633, Approximately $582,878.78 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192088, Any and All Pre-Purchased Flight Hours, Airplane Shares, and Any Other Travel Arrangements NetJets has Credited for Individuals 1 and 2, Including Any Credit or Sharing Forming the Basis for Travel on, Approximately $658,990.02 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192393, Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $3,567.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $62,774.62 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192559, Approximately $123,437.69 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192534, Approximately $173,090.95 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192518, Approximately $107,410.55 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800205112, Approximately $699,753.36 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192179, Approximately $801.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $696,314.56 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192609, Approximately $205,926.67 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192369, Approximately $338,049.59 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192674, Approximately $22,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $3,549,723.15 seized from Meeder Investment Management, Account Number 2370, Approximately $8,223.20 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192781, 14 Karat stud earrings, 1.13 ct diamond/1.29 ct diamond, Approximately $2,926,859.16 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192237, Approximately $9,221.00 in U.S. Currency, Three prong diamond necklace 112 17.1 Tw diamonds/40 Tw yellow diamonds, Approximately $44,620.32 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191973, Approximately $175,725.14 seized from U.S. Bank, Account Number 157514299575, Approximately $4,859,535.55 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192377, Approximately $806,400.00 seized from Crestmark Bank, Account Number 1210590, Approximately $148,716.28 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191965, Approximately $984,530.60 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192724, Approximately $1,549,614.76 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192682, Approximately $205,906.49 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192385, Approximately $18,846.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $3,180,022.58 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800250951, Approximately $429,789.81 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192401, Approximately $157,862.00 seized from BBVA Compass Bank, Account Number 6734699819, Approximately $48,538.60 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191981, Approximately $1,697,154.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $6,567,897.50 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191916, Approximately $95,270.20 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192542, Rotonde Moon Phase Watch, Approximately $6,187,419.55 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192286, Approximately $150,902.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $486,088.22 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192153, Approximately $1,090,590.19 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account Number 0530592877, Approximately $212,467.30 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192690, Approximately $53,982.47 seized from BBVA Compass Bank, Account Number 6728745124, Sapphire and diamond pendant, 14 diamonds and 5.84 Ct oval sapphire, Approximately $415,956.90 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191932, Approximately $74,327.30 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192757, Approximately $14,282.17 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800234062, 18 Karat halo pendant chain with 4.52 Ct diamond, Approximately $2,968,880.56 seized from Meeder Investment Management, Account Number 2371, Approximately $544,035.33 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192252, Ladies platinum 3 stone ring, 1.43 Ct marquise and two half-moon diamonds, Approximately $1,443,614.13 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800253682, 18 Karat 3 row halo fashion ring, Approximately $8,647.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $980,201.44 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192617, Approximately $9,063.07 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $468,745.28 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192245, Approximately $9,689.21 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192732, Approximately $194,769.83 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192260, Any and all luxury box shares, and any other arrangements or benefits credited based on a wire transfer of $782,949.00 to the Stadco Revenue Account Related to the Las Vegas Raiders, Approximately $18,900.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $707,711.92 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account Number 3061715396, Approximately $414,646.00 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192161, Approximately $376,390.14 seized from Etrade Bank, Account Number 37623631, Approximately $58,931.09 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800207688, Approximately $435,709.90 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192641, Approximately $374,088.51 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192039, Approximately $570,108.43 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192278, Approximately $188,182.25 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192013, Approximately $383,219.95 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192229, Ballon Bleu De Cartier Watch, Approximately $53,757.07 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192773, Approximately $41,865.00 seized from BBVA Compass Bank, Account Number 6716963894, Approximately $683,996.12 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192187, Approximately $22,145.68 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191940, Approximately $68,304.49 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800196840, Approximately $143,971.70 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800052795, Approximately $319,601.00 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192021 and Approximately $1,351,143.57 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account Number 0213392373
Claimant: Paulette Carpoff, Jeffrey Carpoff, Marquis Jet Partners, Inc., NetJets Sales, Inc., NetJets Aviation, Inc., East West Bank and Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00485
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gabriel Colwell on behalf of NetJets Aviation, Inc.. Attorney Colwell, Gabriel added. (Colwell, Gabriel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gabriel Colwell on behalf of NetJets Sales, Inc.. Attorney Colwell, Gabriel added. (Colwell, Gabriel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gabriel Colwell on behalf of Marquis Jet Partners, Inc.. Attorney Colwell, Gabriel added. (Colwell, Gabriel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV, LLC added to case. (Wiltshire Alstead, Lisa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) East West Bank added to case. (Wiltshire Alstead, Lisa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) Marquis Jet Partners, Inc., added to case. (Wallerstein, Emily) Modified on 6/17/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) NetJets Aviation, Inc., added to case. (Wallerstein, Emily) Modified on 6/17/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) NetJets Sales, Inc., added to case. (Wallerstein, Emily) Modified on 6/17/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Claimants NetJets Sales, Inc., NetJets Aviation, Inc., and Marquis Jet Partners, Inc.. (Wallerstein, Emily) Modified on 6/17/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Arrest of Approximately $6,567,897.50 seized from Etrade by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date June 2, 2019. (Khasigian, Kevin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for ARREST of ASSETS Returned Executed on 5/16/2019 by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 5/20/2019 (York, M).
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) Paulette Carpoff added to case. (Segal, Malcolm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) Jeffrey Carpoff added to case. (Segal, Malcolm)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/29/2019. (Huang, H)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT for Arrest of Articles in Rem issued. (Kastilahn, A)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Notice of Related Cases, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0485-JAM-DB. (Washington, S)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Washington, S)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Order for Publication, #6 Notice of Related Cases)(Khasigian, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $6,567,897.50 seized from CTBC Bank, Acct No. 3800191916 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $142,139.29 seized from Bank of America, Account Number 195461020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,004,531.62 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800283929
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Karat Fashion Ring, 1.66 Ct. oval/.070 Tw round diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $24,070.81 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192567
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $8,559.93 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192575
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $231,179.68 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,557,738.60 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192633
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $582,878.78 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192088
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Pre-Purchased Flight Hours, Airplane Shares, and Any Other Travel Arrangements NetJets has Credited for Individuals 1 and 2, Including Any Credit or Sharing Forming the Basis for Travel on
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $658,990.02 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192393
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,567.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $62,774.62 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192559
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $123,437.69 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192534
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $173,090.95 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192518
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $107,410.55 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800205112
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $699,753.36 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192179
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $801.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $696,314.56 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192609
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $205,926.67 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192369
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $338,049.59 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192674
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $22,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,549,723.15 seized from Meeder Investment Management, Account Number 2370
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $8,223.20 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192781
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14 Karat stud earrings, 1.13 ct diamond/1.29 ct diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $2,926,859.16 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192237
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,221.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three prong diamond necklace 112 17.1 Tw diamonds/40 Tw yellow diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $44,620.32 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191973
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $175,725.14 seized from U.S. Bank, Account Number 157514299575
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $4,859,535.55 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192377
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $806,400.00 seized from Crestmark Bank, Account Number 1210590
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $148,716.28 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191965
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $984,530.60 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192724
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,549,614.76 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192682
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $205,906.49 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192385
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $18,846.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,180,022.58 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800250951
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $429,789.81 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192401
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $157,862.00 seized from BBVA Compass Bank, Account Number 6734699819
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $48,538.60 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191981
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,697,154.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $6,567,897.50 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191916
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $95,270.20 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192542
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rotonde Moon Phase Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $6,187,419.55 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192286
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $150,902.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $486,088.22 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192153
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,090,590.19 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account Number 0530592877
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $212,467.30 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192690
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $53,982.47 seized from BBVA Compass Bank, Account Number 6728745124
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapphire and diamond pendant, 14 diamonds and 5.84 Ct oval sapphire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $415,956.90 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191932
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $74,327.30 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192757
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $14,282.17 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800234062
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Karat halo pendant chain with 4.52 Ct diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $2,968,880.56 seized from Meeder Investment Management, Account Number 2371
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $544,035.33 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies platinum 3 stone ring, 1.43 Ct marquise and two half-moon diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,443,614.13 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800253682
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Karat 3 row halo fashion ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $8,647.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $980,201.44 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192617
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,063.07 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $468,745.28 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192245
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,689.21 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192732
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $194,769.83 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192260
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and all luxury box shares, and any other arrangements or benefits credited based on a wire transfer of $782,949.00 to the Stadco Revenue Account Related to the Las Vegas Raiders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $18,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $707,711.92 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account Number 3061715396
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $414,646.00 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192161
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $376,390.14 seized from Etrade Bank, Account Number 37623631
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $58,931.09 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800207688
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $435,709.90 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192641
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $374,088.51 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192039
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $570,108.43 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192278
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $188,182.25 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192013
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $383,219.95 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192229
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballon Bleu De Cartier Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $53,757.07 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192773
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $41,865.00 seized from BBVA Compass Bank, Account Number 6716963894
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $683,996.12 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192187
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $22,145.68 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800191940
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $68,304.49 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800196840
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $143,971.70 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800052795
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $319,601.00 seized from CTBC Bank, Account Number 3800192021
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,351,143.57 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account Number 0213392373
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paulette Carpoff
Represented By: Malcolm S. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jeffrey Carpoff
Represented By: Malcolm S. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marquis Jet Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Emily L. Wallerstein
Represented By: Gabriel Colwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: NetJets Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Emily L. Wallerstein
Represented By: Gabriel Colwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Emily L. Wallerstein
Represented By: Gabriel Colwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: East West Bank
Represented By: Lisa Wiltshire Alstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Wiltshire Alstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?