Kimball v. TD Retail Card Services et al

Plaintiff: Diane Kimball
Defendant: Furnish 123, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Retail Card Services and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00554
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Between Plaintiff and only Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Diane Kimball. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Diane Kimball. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TD Retail Card Services. (Norris, C.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by TD Retail Card Services. Attorney Norris, C. Todd added.(Norris, C.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Between Plaintiff and only Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Diane Kimball. (Ovruchesky, Clark) Modified on 6/6/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Ryan Ho Wai Chan for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., attorney Donna Woo terminated (Chan, Ryan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Woo, Donna)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Woo, Donna added.(Woo, Donna)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Furnish 123, TD Retail Card Services * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Clark Ovruchesky* *3148 Midway Dr., Suite 203* *San Diego, CA 92110*. (Becknal, R)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Diane Kimball. Attorney Ovruchesky, Clark added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8187817) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ovruchesky, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball v. TD Retail Card Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Kimball
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furnish 123
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Ho Wai Chan
Represented By: Donna Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Retail Card Services
Represented By: Terrance J. Evans
Represented By: C. Todd Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?