(PS) Barnes v. Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Quiller Barnes
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00558
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing SET for 8/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A) (Mejia, Christian) Modified on 7/11/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order filed at ECF No. 12, served on Quiller Barnes. (Schultz, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #11 ). The motion, as filed, is defective. Defendant is directed to comply with Local Rules 302(c)(21) and 230(a) and re-notice the motion before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 9/6/2019 motion hearing date before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Internal Revenue Service. Attorney Mejia, Christian added. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Form 4340)(Mejia, Christian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Quiller Barnes. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Quiller Barnes. Internal Revenue Service served on 5/7/2019. (Coll, A)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Quiller Barnes. (Coll, A)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction served on Quiller Barnes. (Washington, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: Disregard #5 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, incorrect Initial Scheduling Conference date set. Please see #6 for correct date. (Washington, S)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Quiller Barnes. (Washington, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS REISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Washington, S)
April 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Summons, #5 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Quiller Barnes. (Washington, S)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 [DISREGARD INCORRECT HEARING DATE SEE #6 ] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Washington, S) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Washington, S).
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Internal Revenue Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Quiller Barnes* *8170 Tecopa Way* *Sacramento, CA 95828*. (Washington, S)
April 15, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200097472 $400.00 fbo Dorothy Vaughn by Dorothy Vaughn on 4/15/2019. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Quiller Barnes with IFP application. (Zignago, K.)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/3/2019 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within fourteen days from the date of this order, either a completed application and affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a new IFP Application. (Zignago, K.)
April 1, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Quiller Barnes. (Becknal, R) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Streeter, J).
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Quiller Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Barnes v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Christian Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiller Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?