(PC) Sherman v. Lizarraga et al
Plaintiff: Randy Glenn Sherman
Defendant: A. Krouse, K. J. Allen, J. Lyman, Joe Lizarraga and C. Cassidy
Case Number: 2:2019cv00569
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Randy Glenn Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M).
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Randy Glenn Sherman. (York, M)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT as to Randy Glenn Sherman. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Randy Glenn Sherman, CDC T-17460 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Service Notice Issued re complaint filed *4/2/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (York, M)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Randy Glenn Sherman. (York, M)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Randy Glenn Sherman. (York, M)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Randy Glenn Sherman. (York, M)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Randy Glenn Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (York, M)
April 2, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Randy Glenn Sherman. (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Sherman v. Lizarraga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Krouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Glenn Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?