(PC) Howell v. Lindquist et al
Plaintiff: Kareem J. Howell
Defendant: G. Hampton, D. Anderson and T. Lindquist
Case Number: 2:2019cv00612
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kareem J. Howell. (Coll, A)
June 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings served on Kareem J. Howell. (Plummer, M)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/14/19 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,, served on Kareem J. Howell. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/22/19 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kareem J. Howell. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kareem J. Howell. (Reader, L)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Kareem J. Howell. (Huang, H)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Kareem J. Howell, CDC P-79828 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
April 9, 2019 SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kareem J. Howell. (Huang, H)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/9/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 5/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kareem J. Howell. (Huang, H)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Anderson, G. Hampton, T. Lindquist by Kareem J. Howell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Howell v. Lindquist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem J. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?