Aranda et al v. Sweeney et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla and Marie Diane Aranda
Defendant: Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney, United States Bureau Of Indian Affairs, Tory Burdick, Carol Rogers Davis and Amy Dutschke
Intervenor Defendant: Michael Mendibles, Antoinette Lopez, California Valley Miwok Tribe Tribal Council and Gilbert Ramirez, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00613
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. CASE CLOSED.(Kaminski, H)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(West, Colin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla to #7 Motion to intervene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(West, Colin) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Kaminski, H).
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED EVENT. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (Huang, H)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/19 GRANTING #9 Request to Seal Documents. (Huang, H)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Professor Stephen Dow Beckham in SUPPORT of #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (West, Colin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Marie Diane Aranda, #3 Declaration of Yolanda Lisa Fontanilla, #4 Declaration of Chadd Everone, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service) (West, Colin) Modified on 5/22/2019 (York, M).
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (West, Colin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla re #1 Complaint. (West, Colin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to INTERVENE by Intervenor-Defendants. Attorney Rusk, James Franklin added. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Rusk, #2 Proposed Order)(Rusk, James) Modified on 4/30/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/15/2019 DENYING plaintiffs' #4 Motion for TRO. (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing on #4 Motion for TRO. Attorney McCune, Devon Lehman added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCune, Devon) Modified on 4/15/2019 (Coll, A).
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration Everone, #4 Declaration Lewis, #5 Proposed Order)(West, Colin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tory Burdick, Carol Rogers Davis, Amy Dutschke, Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney, United States Bureau Of Indian Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Colin C. West* *MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP* *One Market, Spear Street Tower* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Zignago, K.)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla, Marie Diane Aranda. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8204208) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(West, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aranda et al v. Sweeney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau Of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tory Burdick
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Rogers Davis
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Dutschke
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla
Represented By: Thomas Frederick Gede
Represented By: Colin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Diane Aranda
Represented By: Thomas Frederick Gede
Represented By: Colin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Michael Mendibles
Represented By: James Franklin Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Antoinette Lopez
Represented By: James Franklin Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: California Valley Miwok Tribe Tribal Council
Represented By: James Franklin Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Gilbert Ramirez, Jr.
Represented By: James Franklin Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?