(PS) Halousek v. Souza
Plaintiff: Sheila Halousek
Defendant: Alan Earl Souza
Case Number: 2:2019cv00615
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 USCA CASE NUMBER 19-16310 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Sheila Halousek. (York, M)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Sheila Halousek. Notice of Appeal filed *6/28/2019*, Complaint filed *4/10/2019* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *6/13/2019*. ** *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 5/2/2019* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Kaminski, H)
July 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Sheila Halousek. (Kaminski, H)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEAL by Sheila Halousek as to #6 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #7 Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT dated *6/13/19* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/12/19. (Coll, A)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/12/19 ADOPTING #3 Findings and Recommendations in full; GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; and DISMISSING #1 Complaint with prejudice because it fails to establish federal jurisdiction; and DENYING leave to amend because it would be futile. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
June 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and #7 Judgment served on Sheila Halousek. (Coll, A)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alan Earl Souza by Sheila Halousek. (York, M)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #3 . (Kaminski, H)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/2/19 RECOMMENDING that the #1 Complaint be Dismissed with prejudice; that the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP be Granted; and that leave to amend not be granted because amendment would be futile. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
May 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Findings and Recommendations served on Sheila Halousek. (Coll, A)
April 11, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sheila Halousek. (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan Earl Souza by Sheila Halousek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Halousek v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Earl Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Halousek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?