(PC) Rivera v. Walburn et al

Plaintiff: Jason Rivera
Defendant: Pikney, Walburn, Solano County Sheriff Dept and Shelgren
Case Number: 2:2019cv00622
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons and 3 USM-285 Forms by Jason Rivera. (Benson, A.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. Box 366, Clear Lake Oaks, CA 95423 by Jason Rivera. (Benson, A.)
June 17, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, Findings and Recommendations, #7 Order along with 1 summons, 3 USM-285 forms, an instruction sheet and 1 copy of the 4/11/19 complaint re-served on Jason Rivera at P.O. Box 366 address. (Yin, K)
June 14, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, no mail reciprocal : #7 Order, sent to Jason Rivera. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/22/2019. (Kaminski, H)
May 29, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not in Custody: #6 Order, #7 Order Directing Prison Payments, 1 copy of #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, 1 Summons, and 3 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, sent to Jason Rivera. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/5/2019. (Huang, H)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Jason Rivera. (Coll, A)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 [DISREGARD-FILED IN THIS CASE DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR] MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jason Rivera. (Coll, A) Modified on 5/22/2019 (Plummer, M). Modified on 5/22/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 [DISREGARD-FILED IN THIS CASE DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR]SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jason Rivera.(Coll, A) Modified on 5/22/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to PO Box 366, Clear Lake Oaks, CA 95423 by Jason Rivera. (Coll, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Jason Rivera re copies of police reports. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. Box 366, Clearlake Oaks, CA 95423 by Jason Rivera and REQUEST for bar association's attorney list. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,, Set/Clear Flags, #6 Service Documents Order, 1 summons, instruction sheet, 3 USM-285 forms and a copy of the complaint served on Jason Rivera at updated address. (Plummer, M)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE from Solano County Sheriff's Office re plaintiff no longer incarcerated in the Solano County Jail and unable to garnish his account. (cc: Financial Dept) (Kastilahn, A)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Hilltop Recovery, 14715 E. Hwy 20, Clearlake Oaks, CA 95423 by Jason Rivera. (Address verified with Solano County Probation's Dept) (Kastilahn, A)
May 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, 1 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 4/11/2019 served on Jason Rivera. #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on Sheriff of Solano County, Attention: Inmate Trust Account, 500 Union Avenue, Fairfield, California, 94533. (Henshaw, R)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/6/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jason Rivera. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department)(Henshaw, R)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/6/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms with Notice of Submission of Documents within 30 days from the date of this order; DIRECTING Clerk to assign a district judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING Solano County Sheriff's Department be dismissed. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the Sheriff of Solano County filed concurrently herewith. Service is appropriate for Pikney, Shelgren, and Walburn. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 4/11/2019. Assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Order and Findings and Recommendations, this case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0622 WBS CKD (PC). (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jason Rivera. (Becknal, R)
April 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Jason Rivera. (Kaminski, H)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kaminski, H)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jason Rivera. (Kaminski, H)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jason Rivera.(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rivera v. Walburn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pikney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County Sheriff Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?