(PC) Thornberry v. Baughman, et al.

Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Thornberry
Defendant: Roberta Percy, David Baughman and John Peterson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00639
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Daniel Lee Thornberry. (Coll, A)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0639-MCE-EFB (PC). (Coll, A)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel Lee Thornberry. (Coll, A)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Daniel Lee Thornberry. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/15/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Daniel Lee Thornberry (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Daniel Lee Thornberry, CDC AF-4405 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Daniel Lee Thornberry. (Lundstrom, T)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against David Baughman, Roberta Percy, John Peterson by Daniel Lee Thornberry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Thornberry v. Baughman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Thornberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?