(HC) Ramey v. Spearman

Petitioner: Jere Thomas Ramey
Respondent: M. E. Spearman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00640
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order to Show Cause served on Jere Thomas Ramey. (Henshaw, R)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/17/2019 ORDERING Petitioner to show cause, within 14 days, why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or to follow a court order. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Jere Thomas Ramey. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/3/2019 ORDERING Petitioner to file his motion for stay and abeyance pursuant to Rhines within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jere Thomas Ramey. (Kaminski, H)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order served on Jere Thomas Ramey. (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/15/2019. Old Case Number: 1:19-cv-00476-JDP(HC). (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against M. E. Spearman by Jere Thomas Ramey.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Ramey v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jere Thomas Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?