(HC) Hanrahan v. Oddo

Case Number: 2:2019cv00641
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robert Hanrahan. (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:17-cv-01495.
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (Memorandum #13 filed previously as separate docket entry) directing Clrk of Ct to TRANSFER action to USDC for Eastern District of California & to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/15/19. (ki) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Hanrahan. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/15/19. (ki) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by L. J. Oddo by L. J. Oddo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Simpson, Donald) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting respondent's motion for ext of time #9 to file answer to petition until 12/26/17 & ext'ng ptnr's reply ddl to 14 days after answer filed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/31/17. (ki) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE re #6 Order to Show Cause. (aaa) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Habeas Corpus Petition by L. J. Oddo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, Donald) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Returned Executed by L. J. Oddo, Warden. (dmn) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of SERVICE of petition #1 & order #6 ON U.S. ATTORNEY on 10/4/17. (ki) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Clrk of Ct to serve copies of petition #1 & this order on respondent & US Atty..., directing respondent to file w/in 21 days from date of this order an answer to petition, permitting ptnr to file w/in 14 days of date answer filed a reply, & noting ct will decide whether to hold hearing on basis of petition, answer &, if filed, reply. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/4/17. (ki) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Receipt of payment from ROBERT HANRAHAN in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 9/25/2017. Receipt number 111021077 processed by aarlidge. (jjs, ) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 111021077 (pjr) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 4 Letter from Robert Hanrahan re filing fee. (dmn) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 3 30 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (pjr) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Hanrahan. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Attachments)(pjr) [Transferred from pamd on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Hanrahan v. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?