(HC) Morris v. Baughman

Petitioner: Condalee Morris
Respondent: David Baughman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00661
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of FILING EXHIBITS by Condalee Morris in SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (York, M)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Condalee Morris. (Huang, H)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Condalee Morris. (Coll, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Condalee Morris. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order and ifp application served on Condalee Morris. (Yin, K)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/23/2019 ORDERING the Clerk to send petitioner a new ifp application. Petitioner has 30 days to submit the required application or pay the appropriate filing fee. Petitioner's failure to comply with this order may result in this action being dismissed. (Yin, K)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Condalee Morris, CDC V-96203 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
April 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for DJ Presider, 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Condalee Morris. (Huang, H)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Huang, H)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0661-TLN-EFB (HC). (Huang, H)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Condalee Morris. (Huang, H) Modified on 4/23/2019 (Plummer, M).
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Condalee Morris. (Huang, H)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for ORDER to Show Cause by Condalee Morris. (Huang, H)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to STAY pending exhaustion of Claim 4 by Condalee Morris. (Huang, H)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against David Baughman by Condalee Morris. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Huang, H) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/22/2019) (Huang, H).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Morris v. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Condalee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?