(PC) Petillo v. Baughman et al

Plaintiff: Sidney Petillo
Defendant: Herrera, D. Baughman, Clough, Castillo, Hainey, Mallet, Villasenor, Porter and Jones
Case Number: 2:2019cv00667
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for Clarification by Sidney Petillo. (Coll, A)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sidney Petillo.(Coll, A)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP-COR, P.O. Box 8800, Corcoran, CA 93212 by Sidney Petillo. (Coll, A)
June 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #15 Order served on Sidney Petillo. (Henshaw, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/18/2019 DENYING #11 Motion to Compel. (Henshaw, R)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #10 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/18/2019 GRANTING #10 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Sidney Petillo. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBITS by Sidney Petillo re #7 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Sidney Petillo. (Coll, A)
May 23, 2019 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Sidney Petillo, CDCR# J-32357 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to COMPEL CDCR to provide evidence by Sidney Petillo. (Coll, A)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sidney Petillo. (Coll, A)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to PO Box 3456, Corcoran, CA 93212 by Sidney Petillo. (Coll, A)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER re IFP by Sidney Petillo. (Zignago, K.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Sidney Petillo. (Zignago, K.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sidney Petillo re #5 Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (York, M)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sidney Petillo. (York, M)
April 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp form served on Sidney Petillo. (Yin, K)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/25/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complete application to proceed ifp, with required certification, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp form. (Yin, K)
April 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sidney Petillo. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sidney Petillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Petillo v. Baughman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Petillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?