(HC) Chaudhry v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Ramzan Ali Chaudhry
Respondent: Wendell Anderson, Kevin K. McAleenan, David Jennings and William P. Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00682
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2019 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Ramzan Ali Chaudhry to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Noorzad, Wahida)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS for MOOTNESS and RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause by Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, David Jennings, Kevin K. McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Executed Warrant)(Hemesath, Audrey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath for Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, David Jennings, and Kevin K. McAleenan, attorney US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit terminated (Hemesath, Audrey)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2019 GRANTING #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Washington, S)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case is assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota; the new case number is 2:19-cv-00682-TLN-DMC (HC). (Becknal, R)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Ramzan Ali Chaudhry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TRO Checklist, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Memorandum Legal Issues Presented in the Motion, #10 Declaration from Saad Ahmad showing irreparable harm, #11 Affidavit notice to the affected party, #12 Proposed Order fixing the time and date for hearing)(Noorzad, Wahida)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Reader, L)
April 22, 2019 PAYMENT for habeas petition filing fee in the amount of $ 5, receipt number 0972-8222092. (Noorzad, Wahida)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, against Ramzan Ali Chaudhry by Ramzan Ali Chaudhry. Attorney Noorzad, Wahida added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Noorzad, Wahida) Modified on 4/22/2019 (Reader, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Chaudhry v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendell Anderson
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Jennings
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramzan Ali Chaudhry
Represented By: Wahida Noorzad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?