(PC) Cyprian v. Constable et al
Plaintiff: Realious Cyprian
Defendant: T. Constable, Second Watch Officer and S. Amador
Case Number: 2:2019cv00689
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Realious Cyprian. (Plummer, M)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/22/19 DENYING #1 at 6 plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel. (Plummer, M)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDMENT to #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, by Realious Cyprian. (Huang, H)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Realious Cyprian. (Zignago, K.)
April 24, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Realious Cyprian. (Benson, A.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/23/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Benson, A.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Realious Cyprian. (Benson, A.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Realious Cyprian.(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cyprian v. Constable et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Constable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Watch Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realious Cyprian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?