Grove Way Investments, LLC v. Centene Management Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Grove Way Investments, LLC
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00696
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 77 CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). See #76 Stipulation for Dismissal. CASE CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (York, M)
May 5, 2021 Filing 76 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/5/2021 (York, M).
April 7, 2021 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby notified that keeping in compliance with the Court's General Orders addressing the COVID-19 outbreak, the Pretrial Conference currently set in this matter is CONTINUED to 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM. The parties' Joint Pretrial Statement shall be filed no less than seven (7) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. The Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 1/31/2022 at 9:00 AM. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/28/2020 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART #51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and DENYING #56 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Reader, L)
October 23, 2020 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby notified that keeping in compliance with the Court's General Orders addressing the COVID-19 outbreak, the Pretrial Conference currently set in this matter is CONTINUED to 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM. The parties' Joint Pretrial Statement shall be filed no less than seven (7) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. The Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 7/26/2021 at 9:00 AM. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 72 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Attorney David M. Marchiano terminated. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 10/16/2020 (Huang, H).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Kastilahn, A)
September 24, 2020 Filing 70 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Grove Way Investments, LLC to #56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Wenger, Katherine)
September 23, 2020 Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez: The hearing on the motions now calendared for 9/29/2020 are SUBMITTED without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
September 23, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of ERRATA by Centene Management Company, LLC re #67 Reply,.. (Stafford, Suzanne)
September 22, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY by Centene Management Company, LLC re #56 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Response to Separate Statement, #2 Declaration of Erinn Contreras, #3 Response to Objections to Evidence, #4 Response to Evidence, #5 Proof of Service)(Contreras, Erinn)
September 17, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of ERRATA by Grove Way Investments, LLC re #62 Opposition to Motion.. (Wenger, Katherine)
September 16, 2020 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Katherine F. Wenger in opposition to #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits B - C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G - H, #5 Exhibit Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit Exhibits J - P)(Wenger, Katherine)
September 16, 2020 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Marc Crawford re #62 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D_H, #3 Exhibit I-J, #4 Exhibit K-N, #5 Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit P-S)(Wenger, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 63 OPPOSITION by Grove Way Investments, LLC to #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Wenger, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 62 OPPOSITION by Grove Way Investments, LLC to #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: #1 Response Response to CM SSUMF, #2 Supplement GW Additional Material Facts)(Wenger, Katherine)
September 3, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of ERRATA by Centene Management Company, LLC re #56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #60 Declaration.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibits I-J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Proof of Service)(Stafford, Suzanne)
September 2, 2020 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Contreras re #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Stafford, Suzanne)
September 2, 2020 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Larsen re #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Stafford, Suzanne)
September 2, 2020 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Familia re #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Stafford, Suzanne)
September 2, 2020 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Bettencourt re #56 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: #1 Cochran Declaration, #2 Hendon Declaration, #3 Moore Declaration, #4 Ottolino Declaration, #5 Schrader Declaration)(Stafford, Suzanne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Centene Management Company, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Response to Separate Statement, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Objections to Evidence, #5 Separate Statement, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proof of Service)(Contreras, Erinn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of ERRATA by Grove Way Investments, LLC re #51 Motion for Summary Judgment.. (Wenger, Katherine)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/19/2020 re: Facts of Parties' Cross Motion.(Tupolo, A)
August 19, 2020 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Marc Crawford in SUPPORT of #51 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E-1, #7 Exhibit E-2, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit I-1, #13 Exhibit I-2, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S)(Stracener, Brandon) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 19, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Katherine F. Wenger in SUPPORT of #51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Attorney Stracener, Brandon V. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Stracener, Brandon) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 18, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Grove Way Investments, LLC. Attorney Stracener, Brandon V. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Statement Separate Statement)(Stracener, Brandon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Re: Facts Re: The Parties Cross Motions For (Partial) Summary Judgment by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Stafford, Suzanne)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/18/2020 ORDERING that the Third cause of action of its counterclaim is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Reader, L)
August 17, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Centenes Third Counterclaim re #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Stafford, Suzanne) Modified on 8/18/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/6/2020 DENYING plaintiff's #15 motion to compel defendant to produce documents and DENYING defendant's #20 motion to exclude plaintiff's expert witness. (York, M)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/16/2020 EXTENDING Discovery deadlines as follows: Discovery completed by 7/24/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/1/2020. Joint Pretrial Statement due by 11/13/2020. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 01:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 11:00 AM, and Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM, all in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Coll, A)
July 15, 2020 Filing 45 AMENDED STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER To Further Extend Discovery And Related Deadlines by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Contreras, Erinn) Modified on 7/16/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
July 13, 2020 Filing 44 JOINT STATEMENT re Law and Motion Practice filed by Plaintiff Grove Way Investments, LLC re #10 Scheduling Order. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 7/14/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
July 13, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Discovery and Related Deadlines by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Contreras, Erinn) Modified on 7/14/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
June 22, 2020 Filing 42 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: (Wenger, Katherine)
June 18, 2020 Filing 41 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Suzanne Taylor Stafford for Centene Management Company, LLC,Suzanne Taylor Stafford for Centene Management Company, LLC, attorney Daniel S. Maroon terminated (Stafford, Suzanne)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/11/2020 EXTENDING deadlines as follows: Discovery to be completed by 7/17/2020, Dispositive Motions filed by 7/28/2020, with Hearing on 8/25/2020 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez, Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Huang, H)
June 11, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extensions of discovery re #22 Stipulation and Order, #13 Stipulation and Proposed Order, #17 Stipulation and Order by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Contreras, Erinn) Modified on 6/11/2020 (Kaminski, H).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/29/2020. (Huang, H)
May 29, 2020 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER re [PROPOSED] AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Contreras, Erinn)
May 28, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Erinn M. Contreras re Minute Order (ECF No. 35)(Contreras, Erinn) Modified on 5/29/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the discussions during the May 27, 2020 hearing, defendant Centene Management Company, LLC is ordered, within seven days, to file a declaration in support of its assertions of the attorney-client privilege for the six documents identified in Exhibit A to the parties' joint statement [30-1]. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on May 27, 2020. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
May 27, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held on 5/27/2020 held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan re: Pltf's Motion to Compel #15 and Deft's Motion to Exclude #20 . All parties present and appearing by telephone. The Court discussed the pending motions with the parties. Arguments heard. Court order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Katherine Wenger present. Defendants Counsel Erinn Contreras and Daniel Maroon present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Tiffany Brown. (Cannarozzi, N)
May 22, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Defendant and Counterclaimant Centene Management Company, LLC's of Improper Filing of Reply by Grove Way Investments, LLC and Request to Strike by Centene Management Company, LLC. (Contreras, Erinn) Modified on 5/27/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
May 22, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY by Grove Way Investments, LLC to RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F , #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H , #4 Exhibit I )(Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/27/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
May 21, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawl of Motion to Compel Bullard, Inc.'s Production of Documents by Grove Way Investments, LLC re #18 Motion to Compel. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/22/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 20, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT STATEMENT by Plaintiff re #15 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #18 Motion to Compel: Motion Hearing SET for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Wenger, Katherine)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: The 5/20/2020 hearing re: Pltf's Motion to Compel #18 and Deft's Motion to Exclude #20 is ordered CONTINUED to 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/15/2020. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
May 13, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Defendant Centene Management Company, LLC, Counter Claimant Centene Management Company, LLC re #23 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion. (Maroon, Daniel)
May 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #15 Motion to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/14/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 5, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #18 Motion to Compel: Motion Hearing SET for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/6/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #15 Motion to Compel : Motion Hearing SET for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/6/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #20 Motion for Discovery : Motion Hearing SET for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Maroon, Daniel)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/5/2020 EXTENDING Discovery and related deadlines as follows: Completion of Discovery 7/2/2020. Dispositive Motions filing date: 7/14/2020. Hearing on Dispositive Motions: 8/11/2020 1:30 p.m. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 9/25/2020 at 11:00 AM. Trial SET for 11/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 5, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Discovery Cutoff to 7/2/2020 by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 5/6/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for DISCOVERY by Centene Management Company, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Maroon, Daniel) Modified on 4/29/2020 (Coll, A).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: Pltf's Motion to Compel Deft to Provide Further Amended Responses and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents Responsive to Pltf's Document Requests #15 , previously set for hearing on 5/6/2020, is ordered CONTINUED to 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/27/2020. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
April 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to COMPEL Bullard Construction to Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum by Grove Way Investments, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Katherine F. Wenger, #3 Proof of Service)(Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 4/27/2020 (Coll, A).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/17/20 ORDERING that discovery deadline shall be extended from May 15, 2020 through and including June 5, 2020. (Kaminski, H).
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Cutoff to June 5, 2020 by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to COMPEL further amended responses by Grove Way Investments, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 4/17/2020 (Reader, L).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/26/20 ORDERING that the current May 1, 2020 discovery deadline shall be extended from May 1, 2020 until May 15, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Discovery Cutoff by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/12/19. (Kastilahn, A)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/2019: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/6/2020. Supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal experts shall be made by 3/20/2020. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. All dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/16/2020. Hearing on such motions shall be on 7/14/2020, at 1:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020, at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately 3 to 5 days. Objection due within 7 days of the date of the filing of this Order. (York, M)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Grove Way Investments, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Grove Way Investments, LLC.(Wenger, Katherine)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Grove Way Investments, LLC by Centene Management Company, LLC.(Maroon, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Centene Management Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Maroon, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Centene Management Company, LLC (Contreras, Erinn)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00252624 by Centene Management Company, LLC . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8227933) (Contreras, Erinn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grove Way Investments, LLC v. Centene Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grove Way Investments, LLC
Represented By: Katherine F. Wenger
Represented By: Michael K. Brown
Represented By: David M. Marchiano
Represented By: Brandon V. Stracener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S. Maroon
Represented By: Erinn Mae Contreras
Represented By: Suzanne Taylor Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?