Naiman v. Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Defendant: Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc. and Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc. Doing business as Easy Rest
Case Number: 2:2019cv00702
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc.* (York, M)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc. by Sidney Naiman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sostrin, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Sostrin, Timothy)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/29/19. Added attorney Timothy J. Sostrin for Sidney Naiman.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeremy Scott Golden* *Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP* *3130 Bonita, Suite 200-B* *Chula Vista, CA 91910*. (Kaminski, H)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Sidney Naiman for attorney Timothy J. Sostrin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8229506) (Golden, Jeremy)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc. by Sidney Naiman. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8229416) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golden, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naiman v. Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adjustable Bedding Concepts, Inc. Doing business as Easy Rest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Golden
Represented By: Timothy Sostrin, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?