Kuntz et al v. John Crane Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Kuntz and Mary Kuntz
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Viking Pump, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation, ABB Inc., Crane Co., General Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Velan Valve Corp., John Crane Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, CBS Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Arcata Auto Supply, IMO Industries, Inc., Viacom Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation and Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00752
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 74 STATEMENT of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(A)(1) by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Yang, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/2/19 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. The New Case Number is: 2:19-cv-00752-JAM-EFB. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 28, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL without prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41 by William Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chu, Kimberly) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Reader, L).
June 26, 2019 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene)
June 26, 2019 Filing 70 DECLINE of JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) Modified on 6/26/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 26, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Arlene C. Barton on behalf of Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene)
June 21, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeremy James Schroeder on behalf of Arcata Auto Supply. Attorney Schroeder, Jeremy James added. (Schroeder, Jeremy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter)
June 20, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter Edward Soskin on behalf of Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter)
June 20, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Crane Co.. Attorney Soskin, Peter Edward added.(Soskin, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/17/19 DISMISSING Defendant Eaton Corporation without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
June 17, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL without prejudice of Defendant Eaton Corporation by William Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Chu, Kimberly) Modified on 6/18/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/12/19 DISMISSING all claims against defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. without prejudice with a mutual waiver of costs. Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. terminated. (Coll, A)
June 12, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER of DISMISSAL without prejudice as to Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. only by William Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Chu, Kimberly) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
June 11, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jane Bow Yee on behalf of Eaton Corporation. Attorney Yee, Jane Bow added. (Yee, Jane)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/7/19 DISMISSING all claims against John Crane Inc. without prejudice with a mutual waiver of costs pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. John Crane Inc. terminated. (Coll, A)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/7/19 DISMISSING all claims against Rexnord Industries, LLC without prejudice with a mutual waiver of costs pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Rexnord Industries, LLC terminated. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 57 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC by William Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chu, Kimberly) Modified on 6/7/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 6, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Defendant John Crane Inc. by William Kuntz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Chu, Kimberly) Modified on 6/7/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 6, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER by Velan Valve Corp.. Attorney Barton, Arlene C. added.(Barton, Arlene)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/4/19 ORDERING that the time for Crane Co. to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to June 21, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
June 4, 2019 Filing 53 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for for Extension of Time for Crane Co. to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to LR 144(a) re #1 Complaint by Crane Co.. Attorney Davis, Geoffrey Marc added. (Davis, Geoffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Attorney Adams, Joseph added. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, #3 Proof of Service)(Adams, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company. Attorney Crochet, Carla Lynn added. (Crochet, Carla)
May 30, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant ABB Inc.. (Martin, Nicolas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika)
May 29, 2019 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika)
May 29, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Erika Rose Aspericueta on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika)
May 29, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Aspericueta, Erika Rose added.(Aspericueta, Erika)
May 28, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER with Jury Demand by John Crane Inc.. Attorney Lin, Carrie S. added.(Lin, Carrie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 44 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi)
May 28, 2019 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi)
May 28, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ingersoll-Rand Company. Attorney Galfayan, Arpi added.(Galfayan, Arpi)
May 28, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Olga Guadalupe Pena on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. (Pena, Olga)
May 28, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Pena, Olga)
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. (Thacker, Todd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Viking Pump, Inc..(Thacker, Todd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter Keith Renstrom on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc.. Attorney Renstrom, Peter Keith added. (Renstrom, Peter)
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Todd M. Thacker on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc.. Attorney Thacker, Todd M. added. (Thacker, Todd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER by IMO Industries, Inc.. Attorney Pena, Olga Guadalupe added.(Pena, Olga)
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER by ABB Inc.. Attorney Martin, Nicolas P. added.(Martin, Nicolas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint by Rexnord Industries, LLC. Attorney Kelly, Daniel James added. (Kelly, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles S. Park on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC. Attorney Park, Charles S. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alice Truong Wong on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. Attorney Wong, Alice Truong added. (Wong, Alice)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jonathan Yang on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. (Yang, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Yang, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER by Honeywell International, Inc.. Attorney Yang, Jonathan added.(Yang, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Ridley, Shawn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shawn M. Ridley on behalf of Eaton Corporation. (Ridley, Shawn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation. Attorney Ridley, Shawn M. added.(Ridley, Shawn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Anselmo, Emily Elizabeth added. (Anselmo, Emily)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine P. Gardiner on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Gardiner, Katherine P. added. (Gardiner, Katherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles Todd Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Sheldon, Charles Todd added. (Sheldon, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Derek Spencer Johnson on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Johnson, Derek Spencer added. (Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation.(Johnson, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of CBS Corporation. Attorney Anselmo, Emily Elizabeth added. (Anselmo, Emily)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine P. Gardiner on behalf of CBS Corporation. Attorney Gardiner, Katherine P. added. (Gardiner, Katherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles Todd Sheldon on behalf of CBS Corporation. Attorney Sheldon, Charles Todd added. (Sheldon, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Derek Spencer Johnson on behalf of CBS Corporation. Attorney Johnson, Derek Spencer added. (Johnson, Derek)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kimberly Chu on behalf of Mary Kuntz, William Kuntz. Attorney Chu, Kimberly added. (Chu, Kimberly)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Kuntz. (Donadio, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Rexnord Industries, LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pump, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Robert Donadio* *Brayton & Purcell, LLP* *222 Rush Landing Road* *Novato, CA 94948*. (Benson, A.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *ABB Inc., Arcata Auto Supply, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Robert Donadio* *Brayton & Purcell, LLP* *222 Rush Landing Road* *Novato, CA 94948*. (Benson, A.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mary Kuntz, William Kuntz. (Donadio, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mary Kuntz, William Kuntz. Attorney Donadio, David Robert added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8240314) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donadio, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz et al v. John Crane Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Keith Renstrom
Represented By: Todd M. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erika Rose Aspericueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Shawn M. Ridley
Represented By: Jane Bow Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Represented By: Geoffrey Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Katherine P. Gardiner
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Derek Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Charles Todd Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Arlene C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Carrie S. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Truong Wong
Represented By: Jonathan Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Industries, LLC
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Katherine P. Gardiner
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Derek Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Charles Todd Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcata Auto Supply
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie R. Bailey
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Katherine P. Gardiner
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Derek Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Charles Todd Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Katherine P. Gardiner
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Derek Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Charles Todd Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kuntz
Represented By: David Robert Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kuntz
Represented By: David Robert Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?