(PC) Joy v. King et al
Plaintiff: Eric Darnell Joy
Defendant: Knight, J. Links and C. King
Case Number: 2:2019cv00790
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Consent or Decline due by 8/5/2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/01/19. (Plummer, M)
July 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Directing Service by USM and local rules served on Eric Darnell Joy. 4 summons, 3 USM-285 forms, 4 copies of the complaint, 4 consent forms and 4 copies of this order to the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/01/19 DIRECTING USM to serve * complaint * filed on * 5/03/19,* on * C. King, Knight, J. Links*. (Plummer, M)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms, and 4 copies of the complaint by Eric Darnell Joy. (Benson, A.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
May 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 5/3/2019 served on Eric Darnell Joy. (Henshaw, R)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/28/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Eric Darnell Joy. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/28/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING Request for Appointment of Counsel; and DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms with Notice of Submission of Documents within 30 days from the date of this order. Service is appropriate for C. King, Knight, and J. Links. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 5/3/2019. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Eric Darnell Joy. (Huang, H)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Eric Darnell Joy (Reader, L)
May 7, 2019 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Eric Darnell Joy, CDCR T-80015 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
May 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Eric Darnell Joy. (Coll, A)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/3/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Coll, A)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Eric Darnell Joy. (Coll, A)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Eric Darnell Joy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Joy v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Darnell Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Links
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?