(HC) Brooks v. Fox

Petitioner: Harold B Brooks and Harold B. Brooks
Respondent: R. Fox
Case Number: 2:2019cv00879
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #27 Order on Motion for Extension, served on Harold B. Brooks. (Plummer, M)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/08/19 GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of time. Petitioner shall file an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days from the date of this order. Petitioner shall also file his amended petition within 30 days from the date of this order complying with the court's instructions in it's 5/23/19 order. (Plummer, M)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to order, to file his affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis by Harold B. Brooks. (Reader, L) Modified on 7/2/2019 (Plummer, M).
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Harold B Brooks. (Kaminski, H)
May 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Order, together a copy of the in forma pauperis form and the court's form application for writ of habeas corpus served on Harold B Brooks. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/23/19 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; Petitioner's failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action; Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED with leave to amend within thirty days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district and the court's form application for writ of habeas corpus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: ECF No. 23 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Harold B Brooks. (Henshaw, R)
May 22, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #22 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0879 JAM GGH (HC). (Henshaw, R)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by R. Fox. (Ott, Gregory)
May 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Harold B Brooks. (Jessen, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 21 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:16-cv-06418.
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Updated petitioner's address from post office box used for inmate money orders (2500) to post office box used for inmate mail (2000). (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 Traverse re #13 Order to Show Cause byHarold B. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Points of Authorities, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS #16 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION Re Docket No. #15 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 12/21/2018 and Replies due by 1/4/2019.Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 Letter from Harold Brooks re #13 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by R. Fox. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibits G-J, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit L)(Ott, Gregory) (Filed on 9/14/2018) Modified on 9/17/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Order to Show Cause, #9 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 9/21/2018.Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REOPENING ACTION; GRANTING #10 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 11 Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Harold B. Brooks. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) Modified on 5/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 10 Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Harold B. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice Regarding IFP)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) Modified on 5/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 9 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by Harold B. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice, #2 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) Modified on 5/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***VACATED PURSUANT TO #12 ORDER*** JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016) Modified on 5/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***VACATED PURSUANT TO #12 ORDER*** ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016) Modified on 5/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/16. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/12/2016. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 12/12/2016. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 1 LETTER dated 10/27/16 from Harold B. Brooks. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Brooks v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold B Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold B. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Fox
Represented By: Gregory Albert Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?