(PC) Barth v. Romero et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Damon Barth
Defendant: Davis, Romero, B. Bell, Rohit, J Lomas, Tsai, C. Snider, K. Mohr and S. Mey
Case Number: 2:2019cv00891
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Shawn Damon Barth. (Yin, K)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/20/2019 DISMISSING plaintiff's first amended complaint with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on Director of CDCR pursuant to #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
June 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Shawn Damon Barth. (Yin, K)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Trust Account of Shawn Damon Barth signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/10/2019. Plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CMF, P.O. Box 2000, Vacaville, CA 95696 by Shawn Damon Barth. (Benson, A.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Shawn Damon Barth. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Becknal, R)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Shawn Damon Barth. (Kastilahn, A)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Shawn Damon Barth. (Coll, A)
May 20, 2019 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Shawn Damon Barth, CDC AI-1662 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
May 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Shawn Damon Barth. (Kaminski, H)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/16/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Shawn Damon Barth. (Kaminski, H)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Shawn Damon Barth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Barth v. Romero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Lomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Mey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Damon Barth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?