(PS) Weilert v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Otto W. Weilert
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Robert E. Weiss Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00958
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, unable to forward: 5 Minute Order sent to Otto W. Weilert. (Becknal, R)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of NON-APPEARANCE by Robert E. Weiss Incorporated. (Klingerman, Cris)
June 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Minute Order served on Otto W. Weilert. (Waldrop, A)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/21/2019: On the Court's own motion and due to availability of the Court, the defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #4 ) is RESET for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Hamilton, Amanda)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Washington, S)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to file an answer to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamilton, #2 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Amanda)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from El Dorado County Superior Court, case number PC20190167 by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8281593) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Hamilton, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Interested Parties, #9 Notice of Related Cases)(Hamilton, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Weilert v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Julie Oliva Molteni
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Amanda H. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Weiss Incorporated
Represented By: Cris A Klingerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otto W. Weilert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?