(PC)Springfield v. Valencia et al
Plaintiff: Ciron B. Springfield
Defendant: N. Counture, A. Valencia, C. Pompey, R. Guitierez, M. Bovcher and M. Boucher
Case Number: 2:2019cv00965
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of ELECTION FORM by Ciron B. Springfield. (Huang, H)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on Director of CDCR pursuant to #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
July 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 , #8 Orders served on Ciron B. Springfield. (Yin, K)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ciron B. Springfield signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/11/2019. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/1/2019 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed IFP and DENYING, as moot, plaintiff's #3 motion to file a complaint. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent CDCR order. Defendant Counture is DISMISSED from the complaint with leave to amend for failing to state a claim. The Fourteenth Amendment due process claim against defendant Valencia is DISMISSED with leave to amend for the reasons stated in this order. Plaintiff has the option to proceed immediately on the First, Eighth, and Fourteenth Amendment claims identified in this order against defendants Valencia, Guitierez, Boucher, and Pompey, or plaintiff may choose to amend the complaint. Within 21 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached notice informing the court how he wants to proceed. (Yin, K)
June 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ciron B. Springfield. (Zignago, K.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0965-KJM-CKD. (Zignago, K.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ciron B. Springfield. (Zignago, K.)
May 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ciron B. Springfield. (Plummer, M)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to file Complaint by mail by Ciron B. Springfield. (Coll, A) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ciron B. Springfield. (Coll, A).
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ciron B. Springfield.(Coll, A) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2019) (Donati, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Springfield v. Valencia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Counture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pompey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Guitierez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bovcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciron B. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?