Landaker v. A.W. Chesterton Company, et al
Plaintiff: Edward Allen Landaker
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Owens-Illinois Inc, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Allied Fluid Products Corp., Honeywell International Inc., Crane Co., CBS Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Goulds Pumps Inc, IMO Industries, Inc., Pan-Pacific Supply Co., Inc., Eaton Corporation, Viacom Inc., Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. Imo Delaval, Westinghouse Electric Corporation and Power Engineering and Equipment Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00987
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Defendants A.W. Chesterton Company and Pan-Pacific Supply Company, Inc. are DISMISSED, with prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Plaintiff's Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF Nos. #32 and #33 ). (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to Pan-Pacific Supply Co., Inc. by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald) Modified on 7/16/2019 (York, M).
July 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to A.W. Chesterton Company by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald) Modified on 7/16/2019 (York, M).
July 5, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Allied Fluid Products Corp..(Boland, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 30 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Allied Fluid Products Corp.. (Boland, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of INTERESTED PARTIES by Defendant Allied Fluid Products Corp. (Boland, Michael) Modified on 7/8/2019 (Benson, A.).
July 5, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael J. Boland on behalf of Allied Fluid Products Corp.. (Boland, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (McClain, Florence)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Florence A. McClain on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney McClain, Florence A. added. (McClain, Florence)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Edward Allen Landaker. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shingler, Ronald)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bobbie R. Bailey on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER by IMO Industries, Inc.. Attorney Bailey, Bobbie R. added.(Bailey, Bobbie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED by Foster Wheeler LLC.)(Park, Charles) Modified on 6/20/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer A. Cormier on behalf of The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Cormier, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Cormier, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RE-FILING State Court Answer with Jury Demand by The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Attorney Cormier, Jennifer A. added.(Cormier, Jennifer) Modified on 6/18/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 [DISREGARD see doc. #21] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) Modified on 6/20/2019 (Kaminski, H).
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jane Bow Yee on behalf of Eaton Corporation. Attorney Yee, Jane Bow added. (Yee, Jane)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Pan-Pacific Supply Co, Inc. by Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Coll, A).
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Richard Alan Brody on behalf of Edward Allen Landaker. Attorney Brody, Richard Alan added. (Brody, Richard)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ronald J. Shingler on behalf of Edward Allen Landaker. (Shingler, Ronald)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Ridley, Shawn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shawn M. Ridley on behalf of Eaton Corporation. (Ridley, Shawn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer by Eaton Corporation. Attorney Ridley, Shawn M. added. (Ridley, Shawn) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Becknal, R).
June 3, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8292613. (Park, Charles)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE: The 5/30/2019 Payment of Civil Filing Fees (Receipt No. 0972-8287105) made through Pay.gov was rejected by the bank. Counsel for Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC is DIRECTED to make payment IMMEDIATELY. If payment is not received by close of business on 6/3/2019, the case will be closed and Solano County Superior Court will be notified that the Notice of Removal was not successful. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/30/19 RECUSING Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Case REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings. Senior Judge William B. Shubb no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv 0987-KJM-EFB. (Coll, A)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
May 30, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8287105. (Park, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Park, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Park, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Park, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles S. Park on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Park, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS052622 by Foster Wheeler LLC . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landaker v. A.W. Chesterton Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Florence A. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Fluid Products Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan-Pacific Supply Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Shawn M. Ridley
Represented By: Jane Bow Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing & Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Imo Delaval
Represented By: Bobbie R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Engineering and Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Allen Landaker
Represented By: Ronald J. Shingler
Represented By: Richard Alan Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?