(PS) Benoit v. PNC Bank et al
Plaintiff: Vonetta LaBelle Benoit
Defendant: PNC Bank and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01063
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by PNC Bank in SUPPORT of #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Cahill, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by PNC Bank. (Cahill, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by PNC Bank. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Cahill, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by PNC Bank in re #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Cahill, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by PNC Bank in SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Cahill, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by PNC Bank. Attorney Cahill, Jonathan C. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Cahill, Jonathan) Modified on 8/1/2019 (Coll, A).
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC Bank by Vonetta LaBelle Benoit.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/21/2019 DISMISSING this action without prejudice, sua sponte, under Rule 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; DENYING the plaintiff's Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #6 ) as moot; DIRECTING the plaintiff to file a First Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days, if she so desires; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to file a First Amended Complaint within said time parameter will result in the dismissal of this matter, without prejudice and without any further notice to the parties. (Michel, G.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED #3 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Vonetta LaBelle Benoit. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 Exhibits, #3 Affidavit Detailing Notice, #4 Affidavit re Irreparable Harm, #5 Proposed Order)(Huang, H)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's TRO request (ECF No. 3). The Court hereby ENJOINS any sale of the Property for a period of seven (7) days following the date of this Order. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended TRO request that fullycomplies with Local Rule 231. Failure to adhere to this Court's Order may result in sanctions, to include dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (Deutsch, S)
June 11, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Vonetta LaBelle Benoit. (Attachments: #1 TRO checklist) (Zignago, K.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Vonetta LaBelle Benoit. (Zignago, K.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PNC Bank, Quality Loan Service Corp. by Vonetta LaBelle Benoit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Benoit v. PNC Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank
Represented By: Jonathan C. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonetta LaBelle Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?