Dunn v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Linda M. Dunn
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01081
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT dated *8/9/2019* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/8/2019. (Huang, H)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/8/2019 DISMISSING this case with prejudice for failure to comply with the applicable rules and orders of this Court. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: In violation of Eastern District of California Local Rule 230(c), Plaintiff failed to file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #3 . Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing, not later than ten (10) days following the date this minute order is electronically filed, as to why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice. Absent sufficient justification for Plaintiff's failure to adhere to the Local Rules, this action will be dismissed. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order to Show Cause this case will be dismissed with prejudice upon no further notice to the parties. (Deutsch, S)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP. (Lee, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP in re #5 Joinder. (Lee, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER by Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP in re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lee, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the July 25, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #3 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Motion Hearing SET for 7/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibits A-H, #3 Proposed Order)(La, D.) Modified on 6/20/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta County Superior Court, case number 192476 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8309022) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-G, #3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Consent to Removal of Action)(La, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: D. Dennis La
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP
Represented By: James T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Dunn
Represented By: Matin Rajabov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?