Simpson et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Simpson and Steven Simpson
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01085
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the October 3, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Remand #7 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Charles Simpson, Steven Simpson. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Barker, John) Modified on 7/12/2019 (Becknal, R).
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by John D. Barker. (Barker, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Erin E. Hanson re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hanson, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FCA US LLC (Hanson, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00255365-CU-BC-GDS by FCA US LLC . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8311191) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties)(Hanson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Simpson
Represented By: John D. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Simpson
Represented By: John D. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?