Denton v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brent Denton
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01088
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Response Deadline By No More Than 28 Days by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Attorney Givental, Alisa A. added. (Givental, Alisa) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Huang, H).
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER by TransUnion, LLC.(Huse, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer for 28 days by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Quinn, Thomas Patrick added. (Quinn, Thomas) Modified on 7/31/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/24/2019 DISMISSING with prejudice Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only pursuant to #10 Stipulation. (Henshaw, R)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for (Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) by Brent Denton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Angelo, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/18/2019 GRANTING #7 Application as to Attorney William M. Huse, PHV to represent TransUnion, LLC. (York, M)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by TransUnion, LLC for attorney William M. Huse to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8360120) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Booth, Eileen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/11/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TransUnion, LLC served on 7/11/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/11/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Angelo* *Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.* *1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Suite 250* *Roseville, CA 95747*. (Huang, H)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Brent Denton. Attorney Angelo, Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8312917) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa A. Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: William M. Huse, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Denton
Represented By: Joseph Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?