(PC)Ireland v. Solano County et al
Plaintiff: Rod William Ireland
Defendant: Solano County, Solano County Jail and Thomas Farresa
Case Number: 2:2019cv01104
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Rod William Ireland. (Reader, L)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for TEMPORARY INJUNCTION and MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Rod William Ireland. (Reader, L)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rod William Ireland.(Kastilahn, A)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rod William Ireland. (Huang, H)
June 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Rod William Ireland. (Reader, L)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Reader, L)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rod William Ireland. (Reader, L)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT Injunctive Relief / TRO, REQUEST for Class Action against Thomas Farresa, Solano County, Solano County Jail by Rod William Ireland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Ireland v. Solano County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Farresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod William Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?