Liebscher v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Andreas Liebscher
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01114
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael R. Simmonds on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Attorney Simmonds, Michael R. added. (Simmonds, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Golden, Jeremy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Searles, Nathan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Attorney Searles, Nathan A. added.(Searles, Nathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeremy Scott Golden* *Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP* *3130 Bonita, Suite 200-B* *Chula Vista, CA 91910*. (Benson, A.)
June 18, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8317693 for $400.00 for filing fee from Jeremy Scott Golden. (Kaminski, H)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC by Andreas Liebscher. Attorney Golden, Jeremy Scott added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8317693) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golden, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebscher v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreas Liebscher
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Represented By: Nathan A. Searles
Represented By: Michael R. Simmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?