Northfield Insurance Company v. Pizano et al
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Shawn Thrash, Uriel Guerrero Pizano and Uriel Guerrero Pizano Doing business as Val-Nap Bar & Pub
Case Number: 2:2019cv01198
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Uriel Guerrero Pizano. Attorney Mannion, E. Gerard added.(Mannion, E.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Northfield Insurance Company. Attorney Celebrezze, Bruce Daniel added. (Celebrezze, Bruce)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shawn Thrash served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Chorley, Jason)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Uriel Guerrero Pizano served on 7/7/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Chorley, Jason)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Uriel Guerrero Pizano, Shawn Thrash* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jason Jonathon Chorley* *Clyde & Co US LLP* *101 Second St., 24th Fl* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Kastilahn, A)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Northfield Insurance Company. Attorney Chorley, Jason Jonathon added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8335458) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chorley, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northfield Insurance Company v. Pizano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uriel Guerrero Pizano
Represented By: E. Gerard Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uriel Guerrero Pizano Doing business as Val-Nap Bar & Pub
Represented By: E. Gerard Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Jonathon Chorley
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Celebrezze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?