(HC) Maquinales v. Spearman
Petitioner: Richard Maquinales
Respondent: Spearman
Case Number: 2:2019cv01242
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Richard Maquinales. (Zignago, K.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Richard Maquinales, CDC T-05865 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Richard Maquinales. (York, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Richard Maquinales. (Becknal, R)
July 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp form served on Richard Maquinales. (Yin, K)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/16/2019 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form. (Yin, K)
July 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Richard Maquinales. (Kastilahn, A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Spearman by Richard Maquinales.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Maquinales v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Maquinales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?