Western States Petroleum Association v. The California Occupational Health and Safety Standards Board et al
Plaintiff: Western States Petroleum Association
Defendant: The California Governor's Office of Emergency Services, Chris Laszcz-Davis, Laura Stock, Mark Ghilarducci, Nola J. Kennedy, The California Occupational Health and Safety Standards Board, David Harrison, Barbara Burgel and David Thomas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01270
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Barbara Burgel et al.(Eisenberg, Jonathan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED on: All Defendants served on 7/12/19 . (Modlin, Peter) Modified on 7/25/2019 (Kaminski, H).
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendants. Attorney Eisenberg, Jonathan Michael added. (Eisenberg, Jonathan) Modified on 7/25/2019 (Kaminski, H).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/19 ADDING attorney Helgi C. Walker, PHV for Western States Petroleum Association. (Kaminski, H)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Western States Petroleum Association for attorney Helgi C. Walker to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8362439) (Modlin, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Western States Petroleum Association. (Modlin, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Barbara Burgel, Mark Ghilarducci, David Harrison, Nola J. Kennedy, Chris Laszcz-Davis, Laura Stock, The California Governor's Office of Emergency Services, The California Occupational Health and Safety Standards Board, David Thomas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Spett Modlin* *555 Mission St.* *Suite 3000* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Coll, A)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Western States Petroleum Association. Attorney Modlin, Peter Spett added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8348997) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Modlin, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western States Petroleum Association v. The California Occupational Health and Safety Standards Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California Governor's Office of Emergency Services
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Laszcz-Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Stock
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ghilarducci
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nola J. Kennedy
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California Occupational Health and Safety Standards Board
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harrison
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Burgel
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Thomas
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western States Petroleum Association
Represented By: Peter Spett Modlin
Represented By: Helgi C. Walker, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?