(PC) Wilkins v. Barber et al
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins and Nerrah Brown
Defendant: Christine Escobar, R. Singh, Christine Barber, Anise Adams, R. Recarey, Monsour and Special Appearance
Case Number: 2:2019cv01338
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Keenan Wilkins re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Kaminski, H)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Keenan Wilkins re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Keenan Wilkins in SUPPORT of Notice to the Court.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Keenan Wilkins in REPLY to #15 Declaration of A. Adams. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Keenan Wilkins re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Reader, L)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of A. Adams in Response to to #8 Order by Special Appearance . (Hennes, Lucas) Modified on 8/16/2019 (Yin, K).
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Plaintiff in support of #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Zignago, K.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Keenan Wilkins. (Reader, L)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keenan Wilkins. (Reader, L)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keenan Wilkins. (Reader, L)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to court of clerical mistake and other pertinent information by Keenan Wilkins. (Reader, L)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Motion for Injunctive Relief served on Monica Anderson pursuant to #8 Order. (Yin, K)
July 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Keenan Wilkins. (Yin, K)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/29/2019 ORDERING the Clerk to serve a copy of this order, and plaintiff's #6 motion for preliminary injunction on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica N. Anderson. On or before 8/15/2019, Monica Anderson is requested to address plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Yin, K)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Keenan Wilkins. (Kaminski, H)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBITS by Keenan Wilkins re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Keenan Wilkins. (Kaminski, H)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Keenan Wilkins, CDC AN-2387 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
July 18, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Keenan Wilkins. (Becknal, R)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/17/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Becknal, R)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Keenan Wilkins.(Becknal, R)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Keenan Wilkins. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilkins v. Barber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Recarey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Appearance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nerrah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?