(PC) Dunbar v. California Corrections Department, et al.
Plaintiff: Eddie Lamar Dunbar
Defendant: CDC Internal Affairs and California Corrections Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv01359
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Eddie Lamar Dunbar. (Coll, A)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1359-JAM-DB (PC). (Coll, A)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Eddie Lamar Dunbar. (Coll, A)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Eddie Lamar Dunbar. (Coll, A)
July 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Eddie Lamar Dunbar. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03784.
July 19, 2019 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to Eastern District of California. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Remark: Prisoner id number corrected. Copies of Complaint, In Forma Pauperis, Magistrate Consent, Order Transferring Case mailed to Plaintiff. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Mail returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 07/18/2019. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 7/18/2019 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Modified on 7/18/2019 (rmilc2, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE To Judge concerning amending Complaint by Eddie Lamar Dunbar re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eddie Lamar Dunbar. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.] .
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Corrections Department, CDC Internal Affairs,. Filed byEddie Lamar Dunbar. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Dunbar v. California Corrections Department, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC Internal Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Corrections Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lamar Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?