Dickfoss v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Dickfoss
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Biomet Orthopedics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01385
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Biomet Orthopedics, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Reilly, Theodore)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by defendants. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil New Case Documents. (O'Reilly, Theodore) Modified on 7/26/2019 (Becknal, R).
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00255768 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8369217) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Biomet Orthopedics LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Zimmer Holdings, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Zimmer, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3)(O'Reilly, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickfoss v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dickfoss
Represented By: Michael Dyer
Represented By: Dustin Jordan Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?