Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. v. Does et al
Plaintiff: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.
Defendant: ABC Companies, John Does and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2019cv01411
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Edmund F Brennan
2 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and ORDER OF SEIZURE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/23/19. (Coll, A)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Judicial Assistant Deanna Morrison for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/09/2019: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Declarations filed in support of its request for a preliminary injunction (ECF Nos. 10-11). There being no response from Defendants on the Court's Order to Show Cause, and good cause appearing therefor, the Temporary Restraining Order is hereby EXTENDED an additional fourteen days. Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 65(b)(2). An order on Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunction is forthcoming. Service of a copy of this Order together with the original TRO issued July 26, 2019 and a copy of the Complaint shall be made upon Defendants by the United States Marshal, state or local enforcement authority, or by any person over the age of eighteen (18) years not a party to this action selected for that purpose by Plaintiff, at the time of the seizure provided herein is effected and that such service shall be deemed good and sufficient. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Morrison, D)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Kenneth A. Feinswog in support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Peter Merluzzi in support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Feinswog, Kenneth)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE on MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and ORDER of SEIZURE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/26/2019. Defendants to show cause in writing not later than 8/2/2019. Defendants papers, if any, shall be filed with the Clerkof this Court and served upon Plaintiffs attorney by delivering a copy to its counsel not later than 8/2/2019. Plaintiff shall file any reply and serve such reply upon each appearing Defendant or his/her counsel not later than 8/6/2019. Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 65(b)(4), any Defendant can apply to this Court to dissolve or modify this Order on 2 days notice or shorter notice as this Court may allow, but no such objection shall serve to suspend this Order or stay the terms hereof unless otherwise ordered by this Court. (Henshaw, R)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Zignago, K.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/26/2019 ORDERING cases 2:17-cv-01169-TLN-EFB and 2:19-cv-01411-KJM-DB are RELATED. Case 2:19-cv-01411-KJM-DB is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed July 25, 2019 in 2:19-cv-01411-KJM-DB will be considered by this Court and need not be refiled by Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Zignago, K.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:17-cv-01169-TLN-EFB by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. (Feinswog, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* Registration No. 3,896,747 * * 12/28/2000 * * Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (York, M)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Bradford James Anderson in SUPPORT of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Feinswog, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Kenneth A. Feinswog in SUPPORT of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Feinswog, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 TRO Checklist) (Feinswog, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8374718) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Feinswog, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. v. Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth A Feinswog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?