(HC) Craig v. El Dorado County Jail
Petitioner: Norman John Craig
Respondent: El Dorado County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv01414
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
August 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Norman John Craig. (Henshaw, R)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/13/2019 ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge to this matter; ORDERING Clerk to serve a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a copy of these Findings and Recommendations on the Attorney General of the State of California; and RECOMMENDING #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be summarily dismissed pursuant to Rule 4 Governing Section 2254 Cases. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Order and Findings and Recommendations, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1414 JAM KJN (HC). (Henshaw, R)
August 8, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200100142 $5.00 filing fee fbo Norman John Craig by Norman John Craig on 8/8/2019. (York, M)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Norman John Craig. (Reader, L)
July 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp form served on Norman John Craig. (Yin, K)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/29/2019 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form. (Yin, K)
July 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Norman John Craig. (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against El Dorado County Jail by Norman John Craig.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Craig v. El Dorado County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: El Dorado County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norman John Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?